Trustees FURZE PLATT (3RD MAIDENHEAD) SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 271398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Jesse Buy Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Simon James Barrett Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Malcolm Peter Burtt Trustee 05 February 2016
None on record
Neil Rasik Trivedi Trustee 10 February 2014
None on record
TONY DOOLAN Trustee 06 December 2011
None on record