Accounts and annual returns NORTH WEST LONDON ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS

Charity number: 271633
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 05 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 22 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required