Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF CARDIFF CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 271840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.69k £8.86k £11.31k £4.44k £11.70k
Total expenditure £13.53k £7.51k £11.48k £6.39k £11.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A