Governing document HOSPITAL RADIO BASINGSTOKE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 1976 AS AMENDED ON 29 APR 1993 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 12 NOV 2007 AS AMENDED ON 14 SEP 2009 AS AMENDED ON 12 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED ON 07 NOV 2016 as amended on 15 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE PATIENTS AND STAFF LIVING ON THE SITE OF THE BASINGSTOKE AND NORTH HAMPSHIRE HOSPITAL IN BASINGSTOKE AND OTHER LOCAL HEALTH RELATED ESTABLISHMENTS. THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE WITHIN THE PARAMETERS AGREED WITH THE HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT. 2. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES THE CHARITY SHALL: I) PROVIDE PROGRAMMES OF INTEREST AND RELEVANCE TO THE HOSPITAL COMMUNITY WITHIN THE TRANSMISSION AREA. II) MAKE THESE PROGRAMMES AVAILABLE TO SIMILAR ESTABLISHMENTS AND/OR ORGANISATIONS, IF APPROPRIATE. III) AFFORD A ?MESSENGER SERVICE? AND CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING A SIMILAR SERVICE LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND/OR INTERNATIONALLY. IV) JOIN AND MAINTAIN MEMBERSHIP OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOSPITAL BROADCASTING ORGANISATIONS (KNOWN AS THE HOSPITAL BROADCASTING ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
BASINGSTOKE AND NORTH HAMPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.