Financial history VILLAGE HALL, SWINESHEAD

Charity Number: 272078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.86k £13.54k £20.56k £8.72k £7.14k
Total expenditure £8.16k £2.32k £4.37k £7.42k £7.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.00k £17.39k N/A N/A