Accounts and annual returns THE SECOND ROYAL TANK REGIMENT MUSEUM

Charity number: 272106
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2010 23 August 2011 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2009 13 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required