Accounts and annual returns LINCEWOOD SCHOOLS PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 272310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 07 January 2025 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 11 September 2023 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 29 June 2022 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 June 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 June 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required