Trustees HAMBRIDGE AND WESTPORT RECREATION TRUST

Charity number: 272439
Charity reporting is up to date (142 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Luci Jane Knight Chair 07 January 2019
None on record
Richard Pearce Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Richard Maidment Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Natalie Bishop Trustee 04 December 2023
None on record
Michelle Hamm Trustee 04 December 2023
None on record
Paul Knight Trustee 04 December 2022
None on record
Karen Ross Trustee 04 December 2022
None on record
Charlotte Corr Trustee 04 December 2022
None on record
Graham Hill Trustee 04 December 2022
None on record
Ian Dunster Trustee 04 December 2021
None on record
Sally Bennett Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Jean Knight Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
MRS SUE GAINES Trustee
None on record
Mandy Brister Trustee
None on record