Financial history WALNUT HEALTHCARE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 272931
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.62m £3.02m £3.95m £74.43k £15.44k
Total expenditure £3.30m £3.31m £4.71m £220.18k £75.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.60m £3.00m £3.92m N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £813 £68 £11 N/A N/A
Income - Other £17.43k £17.85k £32.59k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.30m £3.31m £4.71m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £52.49k £28.26k £60.07k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A