Financial history INTERNATIONAL SCHOOLS OF BUSINESS MANAGEMENT LIMITED

Charity number: 273018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.99k £935.90k £349.56k £474.19k £593.31k
Total expenditure £71.36k £673.16k £441.03k £402.03k £508.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £933.28k N/A N/A £585.48k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £2.62k N/A N/A £7.83k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £644.08k N/A N/A £494.44k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £29.08k N/A N/A £13.98k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £27.11k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0