Accounts and annual returns ST BARTHOLOMEW THE GREAT MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 273388
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 26 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 30 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 18 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 27 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required