Financial history SOUTH PERROTT VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 273405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.04k £19.82k £10.28k £7.51k £7.51k
Total expenditure £6.75k £4.30k £8.38k £16.84k £16.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £8.12k N/A N/A