Accounts and annual returns THE UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP OF EVANGELICAL UNIONS

Charity number: 273458
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2007 04 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2006 13 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 13 February 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2005 25 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2005 25 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2004 04 March 2005 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2004 04 March 2005 4 days late