Trustees SENLAC DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 273508

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Henry Rich | Chair | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Peter Gausden | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Louise Richards | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ellis | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Brooks | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ANTHONY ROY POWELL | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
LEE JOHN FURLONG | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEAN FLORENCE KIRK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.