Financial history THE FREDDIE ROBERTS MEMORIAL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 273533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.44k £2.72k £3.00k £2.55k £2.63k
Total expenditure £2.67k £1.20k £1.61k £2.20k £900
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A