Financial history THE EYE GRAMMAR SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 273613
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £2.30k £2.35k £2.32k £2.54k £2.92k
Total expenditure £230 £280 £540 £525 £2.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A