Accounts and annual returns JANE AUSTEN BI-CENTENARY LITERARY PRIZE

Charity number: 273630
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2015 09 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2014 27 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2013 20 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not Required