Accounts and annual returns THE BUCKLAND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 273679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 19 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 03 June 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 03 June 2024 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 April 2022 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 April 2022 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 12 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window