Financial history BE'ER AVROHOM (UK) TRUST

Charity number: 273703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £344.51k £141.99k £149.57k £133.66k £114.61k
Total expenditure £351.39k £136.16k £152.72k £134.23k £114.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A