Accounts and annual returns THE CUSICHACA TRUST

Charity number: 273837
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 14 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 14 January 2016 On Time