Governing document PITSTONE AND IVINGHOE MUSEUM SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MARCH 1977, AMENDED 25 JULY 1991, 17 MAY 2001, 14 NOVEMBER 2002, 20 FEBRUARY 2003 AND 20 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE HISTORY OF PITSTONE, IVINGHOE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE INVESTIGATION, RECORDING, PRESERVATION AND ACQUISITION OF OBJECTS OR PROPERTY OF HISTORICAL INTEREST AND BY MEANS OF PUBLIC MEETINGS, EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES AND OTHER FORMS OF INSTRUCTION AND PUBLICITY AND BY ANY OTHER MEANS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.