Financial history B M TRUST

Charity Number: 274407
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £34.61k £46.04k £60.37k £60.37k £0
Total expenditure £48.59k £33.50k £47.61k £47.61k £49.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A