Financial history THEALE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 274464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.24k £25.20k £33.41k £36.44k £34.28k
Total expenditure £45.77k £20.96k £31.34k £33.67k £29.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.02k N/A N/A N/A