Financial history RIVERVIEW PARK SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 274916
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.98k £22.23k £17.75k £21.59k £23.94k
Total expenditure £19.65k £11.40k £27.18k £21.92k £30.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.19k £8.00k N/A N/A