Accounts and annual returns THE OLD FARNHAMIANS LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 274931
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 07 January 2020 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 28 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required