Trustees WALGRAVE VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 275035

Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Narinder Hammond | Trustee | 22 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Howe | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hamilton | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph McManus | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matt Shortland | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tim Keeber | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Craig Evans | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Hodgson | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Celia Ruth Court | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Adams | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.