Financial history KINGSTON SURBITON AND DISTRICT SYNAGOGUE BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 275224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.42k £1.32k £790 £601 £962
Total expenditure £1.98k £300 £3.30k £2.84k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A