Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 275310
Charity reporting is overdue by 1714 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 253 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 253 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 619 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 619 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 984 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 984 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1349 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1349 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1714 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1714 days