Financial history DEANESFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 275493
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011
Total gross income £13.54k £14.09k £14.60k £14.89k £13.97k
Total expenditure £3.04k £16.08k £11.65k £7.22k £20.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A