Accounts and annual returns WALTHAM FOREST TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 275516
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required