Financial history ANDOVER DIVISION GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 275517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.50k £10.75k £22.17k £20.77k £17.35k
Total expenditure £4.28k £7.41k £13.48k £34.24k £10.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A