Financial history ST MABYN YOUNG FARMER'S CLUB

Charity number: 275713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £9.17k £11.62k £28.61k £24.20k £22.56k
Total expenditure £9.00k £4.99k £29.43k £19.86k £21.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A