Financial history THE EMISSARIES LIMITED

Charity number: 275735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25.43k £20.12k £20.99k £21.34k £10.04k
Total expenditure £12.46k £5.49k £5.97k £16.26k £13.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A