Financial history THE LEPER LEAGUE

Charity number: 275768
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 30/09/2014
Total gross income £15.06k £16.30k £3.34k £128.05k £416
Total expenditure £14.00k £10.01k £31.50k £86.01k £51.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A