Financial history THE SIR STANFORD AND LADY JOAN COOPER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 275849
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 23/02/2006 23/02/2007 23/02/2008 23/02/2009 23/02/2010
Total gross income £1.43k £2.93k £2.62k £2.59k £2.59k
Total expenditure £1.41k £2.60k £2.61k £2.61k £2.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A