Accounts and annual returns TEENERS CLUB

Charity Number: 276207
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2007 08 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2006 18 June 2007 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2005 30 October 2006 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2005 Not Required