Accounts and annual returns THE WESLEYAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 276698
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 11 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 29 June 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 29 June 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 31 May 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 31 May 2005 On Time