Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ANSFORD COMMUNITY SCHOOL

Charity number: 276752
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2011 30/09/2012 08/07/2013 08/07/2014 08/07/2015
Total gross income £3.24k £7.48k £604 £4.64k £8.94k
Total expenditure £2.63k £949 £5.36k £2.55k £14.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A