Accounts and annual returns MARGARET INGLEDEW CHARITABLE TRUST NUMBER 2

Charity number: 276860
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2008 30 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2007 19 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 23 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2005 07 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2004 28 April 2005 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 Not Required