Financial history GARFIELD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 276897
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £106.91k £100.13k £62.90k £1.30k £16
Total expenditure £98.95k £103.57k £80.47k £3.01k £56
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A