Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MICHAEL SOBELL HOUSE

Charity number: 277043
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2018 02 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required