Accounts and annual returns THE PORCUPINE TRUST

Charity number: 277070
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2005 19 July 2006 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2004 31 January 2005 On Time