Financial history CLINICARE INTERNATIONAL, SOUTHAMPTON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTRE

Charity Number: 277199
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £9.06k £2.22k £2.71k £2.19k £1.17k
Total expenditure £9.23k £4.20k £2.51k £2.50k £580
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A