Financial history NORFOLK ORGANISTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 277560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.37k £2.01k £2.15k £2.52k £2.02k
Total expenditure £2.48k £2.07k £2.09k £2.45k £1.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A