Governing document BRITISH YOUTH BAND ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 277591

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 DECEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 14 JUNE 1994, 30 NOVEMBER 1996, 26 NOVEMBER 2000, 20 NOVEMBER 2005, 29 NOVEMBER 2009 AND 28 NOVEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED ON 10 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED ON 04 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN RELATION TO YOUTH BANDS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.