Financial history BIRMINGHAM MEDICAL RESEARCH EXPEDITIONARY SOCIETY

Charity number: 277893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £66.92k £8.27k £20.14k £73.19k £11.37k
Total expenditure £69.71k £15.57k £25.82k £73.27k £26.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £52.88k N/A