Accounts and annual returns THE NATWEST GROUP PENSIONERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 277974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 10 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2024 27 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2024 27 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 13 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 13 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 13 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 28 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 28 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window