Financial history PITSEA MOUNT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 278318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £29.21k £17.11k £34.21k £37.95k £30.32k
Total expenditure £24.35k £22.00k £37.70k £34.61k £27.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.19k £14.57k N/A