Financial history BIKUR CHOLIM D'SATMAR TRUST

Charity number: 278333
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £190.36k £70.09k £62.67k £53.94k £9.57k
Total expenditure £264.50k £92.12k £61.56k £54.48k £10.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A