Financial history THE CORINTHIAN TRUST

Charity number: 278531
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £24.69k £23.63k £23.38k £21.25k £22.50k
Total expenditure £19.43k £43.95k £16.65k £3.18k £11.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A